judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LINDA COOPER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1188
Short Caption:LINDA COOPER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11519-88Filed Date:10/05/1989

Opening Event Date:10/05/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/11/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/16/1990
Argued/Submitted:12/19/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/14/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLinda Cooper N
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Sydney Jean HoffmannYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901COOPER, LINDA UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF. JOHN KELLY & ROLAND NOTE - 01 BAILEY
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/12/19 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - MEYERSP FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - HOFFMANSY FOR - APPELLEE
10/05/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/23/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PETER H. MEYERS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 110289 SCHPRD DSA
11/11/1989FiledRecord Completed
12/19/1989RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 120489 SCHPRD R
01/23/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (215 PGS. -- SWARINGER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 032590 SCHPRD RT
01/24/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (15 PGS. -- HUNT) RJG PANEL SCDATE 032690 SCHPRD RT
03/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(ORDER JUDGE BARNES DATED 2-16-90 ) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (6-PGS/FARMER) JT PANEL SCDATE 032890 SCHPRD RT
04/06/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (6 PGS. -- WATKINS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 032790 SCHPRD RT
05/15/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 051690 SCHPRD BA
07/17/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 16, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 061990 SCHPRD BE
07/25/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/16/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 071890 SCHPRD V
08/16/1990FiledBriefing Completed
08/16/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1990LETTER GRANT APPELLANT'S REQUEST TO PRESENT ORAL ARGUMENT. CT PANELFF SCDATE 111990 SCHPRD OPE
12/19/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/19/1990ARGUED PANELBESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/21/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELBESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/21/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/14/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD