Case Information: 42770 | |||
Short Caption: | ROWELL (LAMARR) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 35960 , 36693 , 37153 , 37210 , 37242 , 37637 , 37768 , 37834 , 43218 , 44686 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C152233 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/23/2004 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/10/2004 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/10/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 04-02552 | |
02/13/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. TRANSFERRED TO DOCKET NO. 42909 PER 03/08/04 ORDER. | 04-02907 | |
03/08/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. on February 10, 2004, this court docketed appellant's proper person notice of appeal from District Court Case No. C152233. On February 13, 2004, this court docketed appellant's proper person notice of appeal from District Court Case No. C158223. Both notices of appeal were docketed in Docket No. 42770. On February 24, 2004, appellant submitted a proper person letter to this court stating his belief that the two notices of appeal he had filed were incorrectly docketed together. fn1[Because we have resolved this letter on its merits, we direct the clerk to file the letter. However, we decline to grant appellant permission to file additional documents in proper person.] Because these two appeals are from different district court cases, we conclude that they have been incorrectly docketed together as one appeal. Accordingly, we direct the clerk of this court to remove the proper person notice of appeal filed on February 9, 2004, in District Court Case No. 158223 from this docket. Further, the clerk of this court shall re-docket this notice of appeal under a new docket number. | 04-04357 | |
03/08/2004 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Letter regarding notice of appeals. | 04-03517 | |
03/29/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 120 days. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.) fn1[The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits filed in the district court, but copies of documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential.] Nos. 42770/ 42826/ 42828/ 42852/ 42876. | 04-05789 | |
07/23/2004 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2. | 04-13458 | |
07/23/2004 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
08/30/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn10[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted. To the extent that appellant has attempted to present claims or facts in those submissions that were not previously presented in the proceedings below, we have declined to consider them in the first instance.] NNP04-NB/DA/MG | 04-15653 | |
10/07/2004 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). NNP04-NB/DA/MG | 04-18648 | |
10/21/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. On October 11, 2004, this court received a proper person motion to consolidate the above-mentioned appeals. No good cause appearing, this court denies the motion. Nos. 42770/42909/43019/43059 - cases are not consolidated. | 04-19457 | |
11/02/2004 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 04-18793 | |
11/02/2004 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/04/2004 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1[On October 20, 2004, this court received a proper person motion to dismiss appeal. This court denies the motion as moot.] EN BANC | 04-20314 | |
12/01/2004 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 8, 2004. | 04-18793 |