judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALMUS D. CHATMAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1189
Short Caption:ALMUS D. CHATMAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F15443-88Filed Date:09/28/1989

Opening Event Date:09/28/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/22/1991Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/19/1991
Argued/Submitted:04/30/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/28/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAlmus D. Chatman N
Allen Mansfield YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CHATMAN, ALMUS D. AKA ALMUS D. BUSH UNITED STATES
01/01/1902
09/28/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/23/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ALLEN MANSFIELD, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/01/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 110289 SCHPRD DSA
12/27/1989RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 112789 SCHPRD R
04/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (191 PGS. -- JANIFER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 122589 SCHPRD RT
04/25/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (162 PGS. -- SIMMS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 040190 SCHPRD RT
06/19/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(ORDER JUDGE QUEEN DATED 6-13-90) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1991ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE BY 9/11/91; BRF OF APLE DUE BY 10/11/91. EVH PANELRBH SCDATE 062891 SCHPRD U
08/22/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (ORDER J. QUEEN 7/15/91) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/22/1991RECORD COMPLETED
09/13/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR A 60 DAY EXTENSION RJG PANEL SCDATE 091191 SCHPRD BA
10/08/1991ORDER APLT MO X TM FL BRF GRNTD TO 10/15/91. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 092691 SCHPRD GR
10/15/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 101591 SCHPRD BA
11/19/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 111991 SCHPRD BE
11/19/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/30/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/30/1992ARGUED JJ FE TE SC Allen Mansfield, Esq. for appellant; James S. Arisman, Esq. for appellee.
05/04/1992AFFIRMED
05/28/1992MANDATE ISSUED