judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TORRENCE E. HOLTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0685
Short Caption:TORRENCE E. HOLTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12296-86Filed Date:06/01/1988

Opening Event Date:06/01/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/27/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/10/1989
Argued/Submitted:09/27/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/18/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Peter N. MannYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
W. Mark Nebeker YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HOLTON, TORRENCE E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: KEVIN L. LEONARD NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 122288 ORDER: CLK OF SUP CT TO NOTE - 02 TRANSMIT 3/4/88 RT AS A SUP NOTE - 03 RECORD W/IN 5 DAYS; FO: GRANT NOTE - 03 APLE MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO NOTE - 04 1/13/89. NOTE - 04
06/01/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/17/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PETER N. MANN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/01/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 062788 SCHPRD DSA
07/27/1988FiledRecord Completed
07/27/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD R
08/09/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (1019 PGS RT - SCHOCH) GT PANEL SCDATE 080488 SCHPRD RT
08/11/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/08/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(223 PGS/SCHOCH) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED MLR PANEL SCDATE 092088 SCHPRD BA
11/02/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/04/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF RT OF THE 3/16 & 3/17/88 PROCEEDINGS FRM CT RPTR SCHOCH. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF EBP PANEL SCDATE 100388 SCHPRD OPE
11/14/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; CLK TO FILE LDGD BR; APLE BR DUE W/IN 30 DAYS. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 100188 SCHPRD RT
12/14/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/13/89 (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 121488 SCHPRD BE
12/22/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 04. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 121688 SCHPRD M
01/09/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 13, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 011389 SCHPRD BE
02/08/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 2/13/89. ANY FUR REQ WILL BE DISFAVORED. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 013189 SCHPRD M
02/14/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 15, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 021389 SCHPRD BE
03/10/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/15/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 022789 SCHPRD OPA
03/17/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF TIME HAVING EXPIRED JB PB PANEL SCDATE 031589 SCHPRD BE
03/17/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/10/1989FiledBriefing Completed
04/10/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 040789 SCHPRD V
09/27/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/27/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELBESCRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/27/1989SUBMITTED PANELBESCRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/27/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/18/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD