judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ELMER TOOGOOD, SR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0676
Short Caption:ELMER TOOGOOD, SR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Sexual Abuse
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7121-86Filed Date:05/23/1988

Opening Event Date:05/23/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/04/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/30/1989
Argued/Submitted:11/14/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/15/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantElmer Toogood, Sr.N
James W. KleinNY
Milton C. Lee YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Ann K. H. SimonYN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TOOGOOD SR., ELMER UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/11/14 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - LEEM FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - SIMONA FOR - APPELLEE
05/23/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/16/1988STATEMENT RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/17/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/23/1988ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 072288 SCHPRD R
08/03/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 083088 SCHPRD BA
08/09/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (69 PGS - SCHOCH) JB PANEL SCDATE 090188 SCHPRD RT
08/12/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 DAYS AFT RT; CT RP TO FILE EST OF RT IN 10 DYS. PANELPY SCDATE 081588 SCHPRD OPE
11/04/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/04/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/04/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(597 PGS/MILLER) AD PANEL SCDATE 110188 SCHPRD RT
12/14/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 14, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 121488 SCHPRD BA
12/23/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 1/14/89. PB PANELRO SCDATE 121588 SCHPRD V
01/17/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-17-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 011489 SCHPRD BA
01/25/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 2/17/89. ANY FURTHER REQ W/BE DISFAVORED. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 011889 SCHPRD V
02/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 021789 SCHPRD BA
02/21/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL BRF & BA FL; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 030389 SCHPRD CHECK
03/31/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/17/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 033189 SCHPRD BE
05/03/1989ORDER GRT APLE MOTION FOR EXT OF TM TO FILE BRF TO 5/17/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 041789 SCHPRD N
05/17/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-30-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 051789 SCHPRD BE
06/12/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO FOR EXT OF TM TO FILE BRF TO 6/30/89. ANY FUR REQ W/BE DISFAVORED. PB PANELDDW SCDATE 060689 SCHPRD V
06/30/1989FiledBriefing Completed
06/30/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD BE
11/14/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/14/1989ARGUED PANELNWBESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELNWBESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/15/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD