judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTONIO WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0637
Short Caption:ANTONIO WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11611-87Filed Date:05/20/1988

Opening Event Date:05/20/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/17/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/28/1989
Argued/Submitted:01/09/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/06/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAntonio Williams N
Walter S. BoothYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Per A. Ramfjord YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILLIAMS, ANTONIO UNITED STATES
05/20/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/10/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WALTER S. BOOTH, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/15/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 062088 SCHPRD DSA
07/21/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 071988 SCHPRD R
08/15/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (14 PGS - SCHOCH) JB PANEL SCDATE 072088 SCHPRD RT
01/17/1989FiledRecord Completed
01/17/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(172 PGS/RAMOS) AD PANEL SCDATE 113088 SCHPRD RT
02/10/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 27, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 022789 SCHPRD BA
02/27/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 3/27/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 021389 SCHPRD V
03/24/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 27, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 032789 SCHPRD BA
04/12/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 4/27/89. ANY FUR REQ W/BE DISFAVORED BY THE CT. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 040789 SCHPRD V
04/27/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 042789 SCHPRD BA
05/30/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 1ST JB PANEL SCDATE 060189 SCHPRD BE
06/22/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/1/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 061289 SCHPRD OPA
06/28/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8-1-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 070189 SCHPRD BE
07/06/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/1/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 071089 SCHPRD CHECK
07/28/1989FiledBriefing Completed
07/28/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 080189 SCHPRD BE
01/09/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/09/1990SUBMITTED PANELFEBERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/16/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELFEBERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/16/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/06/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD