Case Information: 42781 | |||
Short Caption: | VIDLER WATER COMPANY VS. STATE ENGINEER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A453129 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/24/2004 / Trost, Janet | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/12/2004 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Allison, MacKenzie, Russell, Pavlakis, Wright & Fagan, Ltd.--check no. 23801. | ||
02/12/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 04-02786 | |
02/17/2004 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Representation of Respondent. Deputy Attorney General Michael L. Wolz represents respondent. | 04-02998 | |
02/24/2004 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
02/25/2004 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 04-03623 | |
02/25/2004 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge Janet Trost. | 04-03641 | |
02/27/2004 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Janet Trost. (docketing statement) | ||
05/17/2004 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 04-09131 | |
06/01/2004 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 04-10055 | |
06/09/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK | 04-10629 | |
06/09/2004 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |