judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROSS VS. ROSS

Case Information: 42787
Short Caption:ROSS VS. ROSSCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 43191
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D200480Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:02/24/2004 / Mishel, PersiSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/13/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Lyons, Ltd.--check no. 3877.
02/13/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-02889
02/24/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Persi J. Mishel. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/27/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-03719
03/02/2004Notice/Outgoing Letter. Persi J. Mishel. (docketing statement)
07/06/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: July 28, 2004. 04-12320
08/09/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. Nos. 42787/43191-cases are not consolidated. 04-14378
10/13/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 04-18998
10/18/2004Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 04-19185
11/08/2004Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/06/03, 12/16/03, 03/10/04, 06/03/04, 06/16/04. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. Nos 42787/43191 Tthese cases are not consolidated. 04-20570
11/08/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Errata to Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcript requested for 12/16/03 changed to 12/19/03. Nos. 42787/43191. These cases are not consolidated. 04-20577
12/06/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 04-22215
12/09/2004Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed December 6, 2004. Court recorder Shelly Ajoub shall have until January 3, 2005, to file and serve the requested transcripts. 04-22523
12/22/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 11/06/03, 03/10/04, and 06/16/04. Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. 04-23375
01/18/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Consolidating Appeals and Reinstating Briefing in docket No. 43191. On October 18, 2004, this court entered an order reinstating briefing in Docket No. 42787 after the settlement judge had filed a report indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of that matter. Pursuant to that order, the opening brief for that appeal is currently due on February 15, 2004. On November 10, 2004, the settlement judge filed a report with this court indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement in Docket No. 43191. Accordingly, we reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs in Docket No. 43191. These appeals arise from the same district court case and involve the same parties. Accordingly, we consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. Appellant shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file and serve a single opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Nos. 42787/43191. (05-01065) 05-01065
01/18/2005MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Nos. 42787/43191 05-01113
01/21/2005MotionFiled Response to Motion. Nos. 42787/43191. 05-01376
02/08/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. --Receipt of Copy (Transcripts). Nos. 42787/43191 05-02536
03/01/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. These are consolidated appeals from a final divorce decree and a post-decree order enforcing the decree. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule in these appeals is suspended pending further order of this court. Respondent may file any reply within 10 days from the date that appellant's response is served. fn4[We defer ruling on respondent's January 18, 2005 motion to dismiss the appeal, pending our receipt and consideration of appellant's response.] Nos. 42787/43191. (05-03999) 05-03999
03/30/2005MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 42787/43191 05-06191
04/11/2005MotionFiled Reply to Response. Respondent's Reply to Appellant's Response to Order to show Cause why Appeal should Not be Dismissed. Nos. 42787/43191. 05-07056
07/13/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Nos. 42787/43191 05-13940
07/19/2005Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. as Moot. On March 1, 2005, this court entered an order that suspended the briefing schedule in these consolidated appeals. In light of that order, appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief is denied as moot. Nos. 42787/43191. (05-14330) 05-14330
12/29/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Reinstated. Order Reinstating Briefing (No. 42787), and Order Dismissing Appeal (No. 43191). These are consolidated appeals. As we lack jurisdiction to consider the appeal from the March order, we dismiss Docket No. 43191. As we have jurisdiction to consider the appeal in Docket No. 42787, we reinstate the briefing schedule. Opening brief and appendix due: 90 days. Nos. 42787/43191 - cases are no longer consolidated. 05-25339
01/09/2006MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Dismiss Consolidated Appeals. Nos. 42787/43191 (Cases are no longer consolidated.) 06-00525
02/06/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. On January 9, 2006, the parties filed a "Stipulation to Dismiss Consolidated Appeals." Those appeals are no longer consolidated because on December 29, 2005, this court entered an order dismissing the appeal in No. 43191. The stipulation to dismiss No. 43191 is disapproved as moot. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . the appeal in No. 42787 is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK. Nos. 42787/43191 - cases are not consolidated. 06-02573
02/06/2006Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.