judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DINAH L. BEDNEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0682
Short Caption:DINAH L. BEDNEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7744-87Filed Date:05/26/1988

Opening Event Date:05/26/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/03/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/02/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDinah L. Bedney N
AppellantDinah L. Bedney N
David C. Gray NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BEDNEY, DINAH L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: RAYMOND WILLIAMS NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 12/9/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 02 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO W/D & NOTE - 03 VACATE APPMT OF THOMAS K. NOTE - 03 CLANCY & APPT DAVID C. GRAY NOTE - 04 FOR APLT; BRF OF APLT DUE 40 NOTE - 04 DAYS AFTER COMPLETE RECORD IS NOTE - 05 FILED. NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 08/16/91 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 06 BY 10/1/91; BRF OF APLE DUE BY NOTE - 07 11/4/91; REPLY BRF DUE BY NOTE - 07 11/25/91; SCHED CASE ON NOTE - 08 FEBRUARY 1992 CALENDAR; NFX. NOTE - 08
01/01/1906 CLANCYT VACATED 12/9/88.
05/26/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/17/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS K. CLANCY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/22/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 062788 SCHPRD DSA
07/28/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 072588 SCHPRD R
10/21/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF (THOMAS K. CLANCY) AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID C. GRAY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-05. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 102588 SCHPRD N
10/03/1989FiledRecord Completed
10/03/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/03/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (70 PGS - WRAY) JB PANEL SCDATE 092089 SCHPRD RT
11/08/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD BA
01/05/1990ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO HOLD BRFING SCHD IS ABEYANCE, BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 112189 SCHPRD U
06/11/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (13-PGS/WRAY) AJ PANEL SCDATE 051990 SCHPRD RT
08/16/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06 - 08 FOR ADVANCE BRIFING SCHEDULE. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 081291 SCHPRD GR
10/16/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/28/1991ORDER MO TO DISMISS APPEAL DENIED W/O PREJ TO ITS RENEWAL IN 10 W/ JOHNSON STATEMENT. EVH PANELRO SCDATE 102591 SCHPRD V
10/29/1991STATEMENT OF APLT (JOHNSON) NEEDED FOR MDSA PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1991ORDER APLT TO FL RENEWED MO TO DIS- MISS THE APPEAL IN 5 DAYS. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 103191 SCHPRD TT
11/15/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/03/1991FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
12/03/1991ORDER THE MOTION IS GRANTED AND THIS APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED. JJ PANELJWR SCDATE 111891 SCHPRD B
12/03/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
01/02/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD