Case Information: 42783 | |||
Short Caption: | DAVENPORT VS. RENO AIR, INC. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 0100612A | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/12/2004 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 cash from Debra Davenport. | ||
02/12/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 04-02796 | |
02/17/2004 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from Carson City clerk enclosing an amended certificate of service by mail and new full case history. | 04-02986 | |
02/27/2004 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Respondent Carson-Tahoe Hospital's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 04-03733 | |
03/02/2004 | Motion | Filed Motion. | 04-03948 | |
03/08/2004 | Motion | Filed Motion. Joinder in Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 04-04423 | |
03/16/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. On February 27, 2004, respondent Carson-Tahoe Hospital filed a motion to dismiss this appeal. Respondents Roger Agre, M.D., Bruce Spero, M.D., and Richard Taylor, M.D., have joined in the dismissal motion. fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to proceed in proper person, see NRAP 469b), we have received and considered appellant's documents.] Her appeal was untimely and failed to vest jurisdiction in this court. We therefore grant respondents' motion and ' . . . dismiss this appeal.' SNP04S-MS/RR/WM | 04-04917 | |
03/16/2004 | Motion | Filed Motion. Reno Air, Inc. | 04-04990 | |
03/19/2004 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $150 from Debra Davenport-cash. | ||
04/06/2004 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[NRAP 40(c).] fn2[We direct the clerk of this court to file the petition for rehearing, which was received on march 19, 2004, as well as the addendum, received on April 1, 2004.] SNP042-MS/RR/WM | 04-06326 | |
04/06/2004 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. | 04-05213 | |
04/06/2004 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Addendum to Petition for Rehearing. | 04-06030 | |
04/08/2004 | Post-Judgment Petition | Received Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | 04-06458 | |
04/27/2004 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1[We direct the clerk of this court to file the en banc reconsideration petition, which was received on April 8, 2004.] EN BANC | 04-07696 | |
04/27/2004 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | 04-06458 | |
06/02/2004 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 04-10043 | |
06/02/2004 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/03/2004 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Denied. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed April 28, 2004, and placed on the docket as Case No. 03-10547. | 04-10200 | |
06/16/2004 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 2, 2004. | 04-10043 | |
10/14/2004 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for a writ of ceritorari is denied. | 04-19023 | |
12/08/2004 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for rehearing is denied. | 04-22360 | |
04/15/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address. Littler Mendelson. | 05-07413 |