judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CARL EDWARD MARTIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0672
Short Caption:CARL EDWARD MARTIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6343-88Filed Date:06/08/1988

Opening Event Date:06/08/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCarl Edward Martin N
David C. Niblack NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MARTIN, CARL EDWARD UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 062188 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO NOTE - 01 FOR EXPEDITED APPEAL; CLK OF NOTE - 02 SUP CT TO PREPARE & TRANSMIT NOTE - 02 RECORD ON APPEAL FORTHWITH; FO NOTE - 03 APLT BR DUE 20 DAYS AFT RECORD NOTE - 03 INCLUDING RT HAS BEEN FILED & NOTE - 04 APLE BR DUE 15 DAYS THEREAFTER NOTE - 04
06/08/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/10/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID C. NIBLACK, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/10/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXPEDITE APPEAL CONSIDERATION OF APPEAL MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 061788 SCHPRD OPE
06/24/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/08/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL BECAUSE OF MOOTNESS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/04/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (10 PGS - BOSTON) JB PANEL SCDATE 070188 SCHPRD RT
08/10/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (32 PGS - HART) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1988ORDER CNSL FOR APLT W/I 10 DAYS TO FILE STMT IN ACCORD. WITH JOHNSON V. US SL PANELPY SCDATE 092388 SCHPRD N
12/19/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
12/19/1988ORDER APPEAL DISMISSED. PB PANELROST SCDATE 070188 SCHPRD MEMO
12/19/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE