judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GREGORY LUCAS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0616
Short Caption:GREGORY LUCAS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12777-87Filed Date:05/25/1988

Opening Event Date:05/25/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/11/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/04/1989
Argued/Submitted:11/01/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/19/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGregory Lucas N
Felicia H. Dubrovsky YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
William J. Hochul YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LUCAS, GREGORY UNITED STATES
05/25/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/06/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) FELICIA DUBROVSKY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/08/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 061688 SCHPRD DSA
07/16/1988RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 072588 SCHPRD R
11/11/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/16/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(348 PGS/ALLISON) AD PANEL SCDATE 100188 SCHPRD RT
01/17/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 022789 SCHPRD BA
02/27/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/6/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 030289 SCHPRD BE
04/07/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5-8-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/24/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR ONLY TO EXTENT THAT BR DUE 30 DAYS AFTER RT. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 041089 SCHPRD M
04/28/1989ORDER DIRG VACATING 4/24/89 ORDER; FO BE SHALL BE FLD ON OR BEF 5/8/89. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/04/1989FiledBriefing Completed
05/04/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 050889 SCHPRD BE
11/01/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/01/1989SUBMITTED PANELBESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELBESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/19/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD