Case Information: 42772 | |||
Short Caption: | ELLSBURY (NORMAN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR032055 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/10/2004 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/10/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 04-02578 | |
02/10/2004 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: October 9, 2003; January 8, 2004 (2). Court Reporter: D. Greco and E. Luschar. Filed in district court on: February 6, 2004. | 04-02580 | |
02/23/2004 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 1/8/04. Court Reporter: Deborah Middleton Greco. | 04-03476 | |
03/12/2004 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: March 29, 2004. | 04-04653 | |
03/22/2004 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 10/09/03. Court Reporter: Erin T. Luschar. | 04-05366 | |
03/30/2004 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 04-05925 | |
03/30/2004 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. - Joint Appendix. | 04-05926 | |
04/20/2004 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 04-07293 | |
07/23/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP04-NB/DA/MG | 04-13377 | |
08/17/2004 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 04-13439 | |
08/17/2004 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/26/2004 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 19, 2004. | 04-13439 |