judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEVIN L. LEONARD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0736
Short Caption:KEVIN L. LEONARD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12768-86Filed Date:06/08/1988

Opening Event Date:06/08/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/08/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/06/1991
Argued/Submitted:01/09/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/02/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKevin L. Leonard N
James W. KleinNY
S. Pamela Thomas Gray YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Henry K. Kopel YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LEONARD, KEVIN L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: TORRENCE E. HOLTON NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 06/15/90 ORD: GRANT APLT'S MO NOTE - 02 FOR STAY & APPEAL IS HEREBY NOTE - 03 STAYED PENDING FURTHER ORD OF NOTE - 03 THIS CRT; F/O COUNSL FOR APLT NOTE - 04 TO ADVISE THIS CRT W/IN 30 NOTE - 04 DAYS AS TO STATUS OF PENDING NOTE - 05 MO FILED IN THE TRIAL COURT NOTE - 05 PURSUANT TO D.C. CODE 23-110. NOTE - 06 CONSOL: 91-215 NOTE - 06 NOTE - 07 6/3/91 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE BY NOTE - 07 8/2/91; BRF OF APLE DUE BY NOTE - 08 9/6/91 & REPLY BRF OF APLT, NOTE - 08 IF ANY, DUE BY 9/25/91; SCHED NOTE - 09 CASE ON DEC. 1991 CAL; NFX. NOTE - 09
01/01/1905TRDATE- 92/01/09 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - THOMASSP FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - KOPELH FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 THOMASSP PRO HAC VICE
06/08/1988NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/23/1988ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 070588 SCHPRD DSA
06/30/1988RECEIVED NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT ORDERED BY APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/09/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (1019 PGS - SCHOCH) GT PANEL SCDATE 100188 SCHPRD RT
08/11/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 080588 SCHPRD R
09/08/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(171 PGS/BURNS) PANEL SCDATE 093088 SCHPRD RT
09/08/1988RECORD COMPLETED
04/04/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/14/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-13-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 051490 SCHPRD BA
05/25/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 13, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/15/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 2 THUR 5 GW PANELRO SCDATE 061290 SCHPRD V
07/16/1990STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: STATUS OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL IN SUP. COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 071690 SCHPRD STATE
08/21/1990ORDER DIRECTG COUNS FOR APLT TO FL STMT W/IN 30 DAYS AS TO STATUS OF PENDING MO IN TRL CRT. GW PANELFF SCDATE 082090 SCHPRD V
09/19/1990STATEMENT OF APLT ON STATUS OF PENDING MOTION AD PANEL SCDATE 092090 SCHPRD STATE
11/13/1990ORDER COUNS FOR APLT TO ADVISE THIS CRT W/IN 30 DAYS AS TO STATUS OF PENDG MO FL IN TRL CRT. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 110190 SCHPRD V
12/13/1990APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE AS TO STATUS OF PENDING MOTION IN TRL COURT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/13/1991ORDER COUNS FOR APLT TO FL A STMNT W/IN 30 DAYS AS TO STATUS OF PENDG MO FL IN TRL CRT. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 020691 SCHPRD V
02/20/1991STATEMENT OF STATUS OF MO FILED IN TRIAL COURT AD PANEL SCDATE 031291 SCHPRD STATE
03/13/1991ORDER SS, APPEALS NOS. 88-736 & 91-215 ARE CONSOLIDATED FOR ALL PURPOSES. GW PANELRO SCDATE 022591 SCHPRD V
05/02/1991RECORD ON APPEAL IN 91-215 AJ PANEL SCDATE 042691 SCHPRD R
05/16/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (12-PGS/JOHNSON) IN 91-215 AJ PANEL SCDATE 053091 SCHPRD RT
06/03/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 07-09. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 052791 SCHPRD CHECK
07/22/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 080291 SCHPRD BA
07/26/1991MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF S. PAMELA THOMAS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE FOR APPELLANT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 090691 SCHPRD BE
09/06/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
09/27/1991ORDER GRANT MO OF S. PAMELA THOMAS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/06/1991ORDER CASE SHALL BE SCHD FOR CONSI- DERATION BEFORE A MERITS DIV. IN JANUARY, 1992. KHO PANEL SCDATE 110691 SCHPRD O
12/18/1991MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING PURSUANT TO VS & ORDER ENTERED RESCHDULING KHO PANEL SCDATE 121891 SCHPRD MEMO
12/26/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/26/1991RECEIVED APLT REPLY BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/03/1992ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOT FOR LV TO LATE FILE RBA. MEH PANELROTEST SCDATE 123091 SCHPRD VS
01/03/1992APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 010792 SCHPRD OPE
01/08/1992CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/09/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/09/1992ARGUED PANELRGTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/09/1992MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING APLT'S CORRESPON- DENCE PURSUANT TO RULE 28 K KHO PANEL SCDATE 010992 SCHPRD MEMO
02/07/1992AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENTS OF CONVICTION PANELRGTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/07/1992DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -RO CITE
02/07/1992OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - RO PAGE # - 0382
03/02/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/2002APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to recall the mandate
01/28/2002On consideration of appellant's pro se motion to file for recall of the mandate and appellant's pro se amend and supplemental motion according to D.C. Rule of Criminal procedure 15 (a), it is ORDERED that the motions are denied. See D.C. Rule 41 (c). (TESTKG)