judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSEPH T. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0719
Short Caption:JOSEPH T. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5056-86Filed Date:06/10/1988

Opening Event Date:06/10/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/06/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Anita Isicson NN
AppellantJoseph T. Johnson N
Calvin Steinmetz YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JOHNSON, JOSEPH T. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: FRANK W. WINSTON & NOTE - 01 WILLIAMS J. BYRD
01/01/1906 STEINMETZC CO-COUNSEL
06/10/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/28/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ANITA ISICSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/07/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 070888 SCHPRD DSA
08/11/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (8 PGS RT - PIRFO / 15 PGS RT HUNT / 17 PGS RT - LEWIS) GT PANEL SCDATE 080988 SCHPRD R
08/12/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/23/1988RECEIVED 3 DAYS LATE APPALLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 092088 SCHPRD BA
09/26/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF THREE (3) DAYS LATE GT PANEL SCDATE 100388 SCHPRD CHECK
10/21/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/21/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO LV TO FL BRF, CLK TO FL BRF, APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELPY SCDATE 101088 SCHPRD OPE
11/23/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS AFTER ALL TRANSCRIPTS ARE DOCKETED AD PANEL SCDATE 112188 SCHPRD BE
12/23/1988ORDER GRANT APLE MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 30 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/28/1989ORDER ALL RT IS COMPLETE - BA DUE IN 40 DAYS. ACG PANELRO SCDATE 020189 SCHPRD CHECK
07/31/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL (PRO SE) RJG PANEL SCDATE 090689 SCHPRD BA
08/02/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
08/10/1989ORDER GRANT MO'S OF APLT & COUNSEL & CASE IS DISMISSED. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 080289 SCHPRD Q
08/10/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
09/06/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD