judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ELVIN JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0689
Short Caption:ELVIN JOHNSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F293-81Filed Date:06/02/1988

Opening Event Date:06/02/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/24/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/06/1988
Argued/Submitted:03/29/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/28/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantElvin Johnson N
M. Elizabeth Kent YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Roberto Iraola YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JOHNSON, ELVIN UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: GREGORY STEWART NOTE - 01
01/01/1904JUDGE - SW AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/03/29 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - KENTM FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - IRAOLAR FOR - APPELLEE
06/02/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/17/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) M. ELIZABETH KENT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/24/1988FiledRecord Completed
06/24/1988RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD R
06/27/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/27/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 062788 SCHPRD DSA
08/05/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (LETTERS & MEMORANDUM AND JUDGMENT) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/08/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD BA
08/31/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 6TH (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 090788 SCHPRD BE
10/06/1988FiledBriefing Completed
10/06/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 100688 SCHPRD BE
10/28/1988APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO SUPP REC & CLK TO FL EXCERPTS FROM TRL RT AS SUPP REC. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 110888 SCHPRD Q
11/14/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD EXCERPTS FROM TRIAL TRANSCRIPT DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/29/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/29/1989ARGUED PANELNWBEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/07/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWBEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/07/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE 562 A.2d 603 (PRINTED OP FILED 7/25/89)
04/07/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - BE PAGE # - 0582 -A OPINION TYPE C JUDGE - NW PAGE # - 0000
04/28/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1989MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLEE'S FOR PUBLICATION OF OPINION RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/15/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO PUBLISH MOJ & CLK TO CAUSE DECISION TO BE PUBLISHED. DAS PANELNWBEST SCDATE 051889 SCHPRD VS