judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM G. BROWN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0692
Short Caption:WILLIAM G. BROWN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F174-88Filed Date:05/27/1988

Opening Event Date:05/27/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/27/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/20/1990
Argued/Submitted:06/19/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/19/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam G. Brown N
Gerson Simon YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Norman C. Bay YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BROWN, WILLIAM G. UNITED STATES
05/27/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/17/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) GERSON SIMON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/27/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 062788 SCHPRD DSA
07/27/1988FiledRecord Completed
07/27/1988RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 072688 SCHPRD R
07/28/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD BA
09/20/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(158 PGS/RHOADES) AD PANEL SCDATE 100188 SCHPRD RT
07/18/1989ORDER DENY MO TO EXT TM TO COMPLETE RT; RT DUE IN 10 DAYS. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
08/07/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF COURT REPORTER JANIFER TO EXT TM TO FL RT BY 8/15/89; NFX. DAS PANELMK SCDATE 070189 SCHPRD RT
08/16/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (195 PGS. -- JANIFER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 081589 SCHPRD RT
08/29/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/29/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(13 PGS/BURNEY) AD PANEL SCDATE 072889 SCHPRD RT
10/06/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10-28-89 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 100989 SCHPRD BA
10/12/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/28/89. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 101089 SCHPRD M
10/30/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 13, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 102889 SCHPRD BA
11/13/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD BA
11/13/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/13/89; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 110889 SCHPRD V
12/18/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 18, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 122889 SCHPRD BE
12/29/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRIEF TO 1/18/90. GW PANELDDW SCDATE 121989 SCHPRD V
01/18/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 19, 1990 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 011890 SCHPRD BE
02/16/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/19/90; NFX GW PANELRBH SCDATE 020590 SCHPRD M
02/20/1990FiledBriefing Completed
02/20/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 022090 SCHPRD BE
06/19/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/19/1990SUBMITTED PANELFESCRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/27/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGEMENT ON APPEAL RJG PANELFESWRY SCDATE 061990 SCHPRD RDEC
06/27/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/19/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD