judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RAYMOND A. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0691
Short Caption:RAYMOND A. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7743-87Filed Date:06/03/1988

Opening Event Date:06/03/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/23/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/14/1989
Argued/Submitted:01/18/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/15/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
J. Gerard Lewis NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Thomas M. Slawson YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Joyce J. Bang YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILLIAMS, RAYMOND A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: DINAH BEDNEY NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 3/17/89 ORD: APPMT OF J.GERARD NOTE - 02 LEWIS VACATED & THOMAS M. NOTE - 03 SLAWSON APPTD FOR APLT; MR. NOTE - 03 LEWIS TO TRANSMIT TO MR SLAWSN NOTE - 04 ALL NECESSARY PAPERS FOR APL; NOTE - 04 BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 05 051089 OR: ON OR BEF 5/25/89, NOTE - 05 INDICATING RECORD & TRANSCRIPT NOTE - 06 HAVE BEEN FORWARDED TO MR. NOTE - 06 SLAWSON AS DIRECTED. FVH NOTE - 07 8/14/89 ORD: GRT APLE'S MO TO NOTE - 07 FILE BRF AND THE LODGED BRF OF NOTE - 08 APLE IS HEREBY FILED. FO THAT NOTE - 08 THIS APPEAL SHALL BE SCHD FOR NOTE - 09 CONSIDERATION AS SOON AS THE NOTE - 09 CALENDAR PERMITS.
01/01/1906 LEWISJG VACATED 3/17/89.
06/03/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/17/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) J. GERARD LEWIS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/14/1988ORDER APLT DSA DUE IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 062788 SCHPRD DSA
07/25/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 072588 SCHPRD DSA
08/04/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 080288 SCHPRD R
11/23/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/23/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/23/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (146 PGS RT - WRAY) GT PANEL SCDATE 101588 SCHPRD RT
01/19/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL TO FILE BA BY 2/7/89 OR SHOW CAUSE WHY APPT SHOULD NOT BE VACATED (FVH) PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/09/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 17TH JB PANEL SCDATE 020789 SCHPRD BA
03/17/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS M. SLAWSON, ESQ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-04. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 022889 SCHPRD Q
04/12/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 042489 SCHPRD BA
05/10/1989ORDER DIRG J. GERARD LEWIS, ESQ. TO COMPLY WITH 3/17/89 OR & FILE STATEMENT (SEE NOTES 5 & 6) PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/26/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S STATEMENT RE: FORWARDING OF RECORDS & TRANS- CRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 052589 SCHPRD ANSA
06/28/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7/27/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD BE
07/27/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/10/89 MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF (MXBE STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/14/1989FiledBriefing Completed
08/14/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/14/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 7 THRU 9 SL PANELRBH SCDATE 073189 SCHPRD N
10/03/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (70 PGS - WRAY) JB (SEE 88-682 FOR RT) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/18/1990SUBMITTED PANELNWFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELNWFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/15/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD