judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SAMPLER, KEITH RICARDO DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 86-CT-1568
Short Caption:SAMPLER, KEITH RICARDO DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - Traffic
Lead: 86-CT-0952 Consolidated:86-CT-1568
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:T11641-85Filed Date:11/14/1986

Opening Event Date:11/14/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/25/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/22/1988
Argued/Submitted:07/14/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/09/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Marvin E. Clemons NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SAMPLER, KEITH RICARDO DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 T: NO INSURANCE ON TAXI NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 12/23/87 ORD: GRANTG MO OF NOTE - 02 APLT TO CONSOL 86-952 AND NOTE - 03 86-1568; BRF IN 86-952 DEEMED NOTE - 03 BRF OF APLT IN 86-1568; CONSOL NOTE - 04 BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 CON 86-952 NOTE - 05
11/14/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MARVIN CLEMONS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/11/1987RECORD ON APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 011387 SCHPRD R
04/02/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD JUDGEMENT AND COMMITMENT/PRO- BATION ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/21/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (42 PGS - LIMATO) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/25/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/25/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF (BRF FILED IN 86-952; SEE 12/23/87 ORDER) CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/27/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE APLT BR OR VACATE APPNTMT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD BA
11/03/1987APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S 10/27/87 ORDER PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE & ADOPT BRIEF OF 86-952 PB PANEL SCDATE 110687 SCHPRD BA
12/23/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-04 CWC PANELPY SCDATE 111687 SCHPRD CHECK
01/22/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/22/88 PB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 012288 SCHPRD BE
03/22/1988FiledBriefing Completed
03/22/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 032288 SCHPRD BE
07/14/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/14/1988SUBMITTED PANELMKNWBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELMKNWBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
08/09/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD