Case Information: 40860 | |||
Short Caption: | WARD VS. LAWRENCE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A404550 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/03/2003 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/03/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 03-01839 | |
03/04/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP03-RR/WM/MG "MISSING DOCUMENT" | 03-03517 | |
04/01/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 03-03647 | |
04/01/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/10/2003 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 3, 2003. | 03-03647 |