judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHRISTOPHER WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0442
Short Caption:CHRISTOPHER WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8581-86Filed Date:04/22/1987

Opening Event Date:04/22/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/24/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/05/1988
Argued/Submitted:11/10/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/30/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantChristopher Williams N
Paul H. ZukerbergYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Heidi M. Pasichow YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/11/10 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - ZUKERBERGP FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - PASICHOWH FOR - APPELLEE
04/22/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/04/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PAUL H. ZUKERBERG, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/06/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 062287 SCHPRD R
06/25/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/30/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 080487 SCHPRD BA
09/04/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (87 PGS - SIMMS) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/10/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2( 131 PGS. -- DAVIS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 110187 SCHPRD RT
12/24/1987FiledRecord Completed
12/24/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/24/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (15 PGS - WRAY) JB PANEL SCDATE 120187 SCHPRD RT
02/02/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 020288 SCHPRD BA
03/03/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/5/88 PB PANEL SCDATE 030388 SCHPRD BE
03/08/1988APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MXBE FILED 3/3/88 GT PANEL SCDATE 031588 SCHPRD OPA
03/22/1988ORDER GRT APLE'S MO FOR EXT OF TM TO TO FILE BRF TO 4/5/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 031188 SCHPRD N
04/05/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/5/88 MLH PANEL SCDATE 040588 SCHPRD BE
04/29/1988ORDER GRT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRF TO 5/5/88 ABSOLUTELY NFX SL PANELPY SCDATE 042288 SCHPRD N
05/05/1988FiledBriefing Completed
05/05/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 050588 SCHPRD BE
05/10/1988RECEIVED OPPOSITION OF APPELLANT TO MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/08/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/14/1988LETTER GRANT REQ OF APLT FOR ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 11/10/88. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 091988 SCHPRD OPE
11/10/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/10/1988ARGUED PANELRGMKTE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELRGMKTE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/30/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD