judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HENRY C. WILSON, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0418
Short Caption:HENRY C. WILSON, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1009-81Filed Date:04/06/1987

Opening Event Date:04/06/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/04/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/22/1988
Argued/Submitted:06/06/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/27/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHenry C. Wilson, Jr.N
Steven Weinberg YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Edith S. Marshall YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILSON JR., HENRY C. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 FE: ROB W/ARMED NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 1/22/88 ORD: GRT APLE'S MO FOR NOTE - 02 LV TO FILE BRIER; CLK DIRTD TO NOTE - 03 FILE LODGED BRIEF. FO THAT CLK NOTE - 03 IS DIRTD TO CALENDAR THIS CASE NOTE - 04 FOR CONSIDERATION BEFORE A NOTE - 04 MERITS DIV. AS SOON AS THE NOTE - 05 BUSINESS OF THE COURT PERMITS. NOTE - 05
04/06/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/04/1987FiledRecord Completed
06/04/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 060587 SCHPRD R
06/10/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEVEN WEINBERG, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 043087 SCHPRD CHECK
06/22/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 062287 SCHPRD DSA
06/23/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/03/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 3, 1987 (NO OPPO) RJG NFX. PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD BA
10/06/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF LATE (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 100387 SCHPRD BA
10/06/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL BRF OF APLT; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS.DAS PANELPY SCDATE 101687 SCHPRD CHECK
11/17/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DEC 15TH (NO OPA) MLH PANEL SCDATE 112387 SCHPRD BE
12/16/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OUT OF TIME PB PANEL SCDATE 121587 SCHPRD BE
12/16/1987RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/22/1988FiledBriefing Completed
01/22/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/22/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 2 THRU 5 SL PANELPY SCDATE 010688 SCHPRD SL
06/06/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/06/1988SUBMITTED PANELBESTRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF ORDER ON APPEAL PANELBESTRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/27/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD