judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALEXIS WILLIAM V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0412
Short Caption:ALEXIS WILLIAM V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7519-86Filed Date:04/07/1987

Opening Event Date:04/07/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/03/1991Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/21/1991
Argued/Submitted:11/06/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/02/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAlexis William N
Steven R. KiershYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Henry K. Kopel YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILLIAM, ALEXIS UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 072887 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO NOTE - 01 FOR LV TO FILE DOCKETING STATE NOTE - 02 CLK TO FILE LDGD DOCKETING NOTE - 02 STATE; COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 20 NOTE - 03 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS NOTE - 03 OF RT, INDICATING NAME OF CT NOTE - 04 REPORTERS PREPARING TRANSCRIPT NOTE - 04 ESTIMATED # OF PGS & ESTIMATED NOTE - 05 COMPLETION DATE OF RT. NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 8/10/90 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 06 BY 9/26/90; BRF OF APLS DUE BY NOTE - 07 11/9/90; REPLY BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 07 BY 11/28/90; CLK TO SCHED CASE NOTE - 08 ON JANUARY 1991 CAL. NOTE - 08 NOTE - 09 3/5/91 ORD: DENY APLT'S MO TO NOTE - 09 ACCEPT BRF UNTIMELY AND GRT NOTE - 10 APLE'S MO TO STAY BRFG SCHD NOTE - 10 TO THE EXTENT THAT COUNSEL FOR NOTE - 11 APLT IS DIRTD TO TAKE THE NOTE - 11 NECESSARY STEPS TO ARRANGE FOR NOTE - 12 THE ORDERING OF THE TRANSCRIPT NOTE - 12 W/I 5 DAYS FROM DATE OF THIS NOTE - 13 ORDER OR APPTMT OF COUNSEL NOTE - 13 UNDER THE CRIM. JUSTICE ACT NOTE - 14 SHALL BE VACATED AND COUNSEL NOTE - 14 STRICKEN FROM THE LIST OF NOTE - 15 ATTYS ELIGIBLE FOR APPTMT NOTE - 15 UNDER CJA.
04/07/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/04/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 060887 SCHPRD R
06/10/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEVEN R. KIERSH, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 052587 SCHPRD CHECK
06/24/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT PB PANEL SCDATE 062287 SCHPRD DSA
07/06/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS JB PANEL SCDATE 070687 SCHPRD CHECK
07/28/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/28/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 05. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 071587 SCHPRD OPE
08/04/1987APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO JULY 28TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 081787 SCHPRD STATE
02/07/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL W/IN 20 DAYS TO FILE STMT RE RT (NAME OF RPTR, DATE ORD, EST DATE) FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1989APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER DATED 2/7/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 022889 SCHPRD STATE
04/07/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO TAKE STEPS TO ORD RT & FILE STATE W/THIS CT. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 110187 SCHPRD RT
04/19/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING TRANS- CRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 041789 SCHPRD STATE
06/12/1989ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING BA UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT DOCKETED. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/11/1990ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT, W/IN 20 DAYS TO FILE SRT (NAME OF RPTR ETC.) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06-08 FOR ADVANCED BRIEFING ORDER. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 080990 SCHPRD U
10/11/1990ORDER CNSL FOR APLT TO FL HIS BRF IN 10 DAYS OR HIS NAME WILL BE REMOVED FROM CJA LIST. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 102290 SCHPRD BA
10/22/1990RECEIVED APLT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR STAY & REQUIRE PREPARATION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 110990 SCHPRD BE
03/05/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 9 THRU 15 SL PANELRO SCDATE 112190 SCHPRD OPA
03/12/1991APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER DATED 3/5/91 RJG PANEL SCDATE 031191 SCHPRD CHECK
04/03/1991FiledRecord Completed
04/03/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(184 PGS/RONAN) AD PANEL SCDATE 051391 SCHPRD RT
04/19/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/21/1991FiledBriefing Completed
05/21/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 052391 SCHPRD BE
11/06/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/06/1991SUBMITTED PANELRGFEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGFEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/02/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD