judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANDRE D. RUTH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0420
Short Caption:ANDRE D. RUTH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8843-86Filed Date:04/06/1987

Opening Event Date:04/06/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/20/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/04/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAndre D. Ruth N
Steven H. GoldblattNN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901RUTH, ANDRE D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: EARL WASHINGTON NOTE - 01
04/06/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/04/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 060587 SCHPRD R
06/10/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEVEN H. GOLDBLATT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 052587 SCHPRD CHECK
06/19/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 062287 SCHPRD DSA
08/25/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (6 PGS - BURNS) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (23 PGS. -- BURNS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 031588 SCHPRD RT
05/11/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (258 PGS - MILLER) GT PANEL SCDATE 042288 SCHPRD RT
05/19/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL SUPPLEMENTAL TRANSCRIPT IS FILED. (NO OPE) GT (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 062088 SCHPRD BA
10/20/1988FiledRecord Completed
10/20/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/20/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(47 PGS/MILLER) AD PANEL SCDATE 090188 SCHPRD RT
11/23/1988STIPULATION TO DISMISS APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 112988 SCHPRD BA
12/14/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
12/14/1988ORDER PER STIP, CASE DISMISSED. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 120688 SCHPRD Q
12/14/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
01/04/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD