Case Information: 40863 | |||
Short Caption: | BANK OF AMERICA VS. ROBERT JONES CO. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 36866 , 37003 , 40120 , 40473 , 40848 , 40862 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A403774 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Shearing | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/11/2003 / Shirinian, Ara | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/04/2003 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Shearing. Law firm of Gordon & Silver. | ||
02/04/2003 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Gordon & Silver--check no. 31502. | ||
02/04/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 03-01867 | |
02/11/2003 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
02/18/2003 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 03-02679 | |
02/18/2003 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Ara H. Shirinian. (Docketing statement) | ||
11/05/2003 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 03-18407 | |
11/13/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK | 03-18935 | |
11/13/2003 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |