judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TONY THOMPSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0424
Short Caption:TONY THOMPSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3133-86Filed Date:04/24/1987

Opening Event Date:04/24/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/19/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/23/1988
Argued/Submitted:06/23/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/14/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTony Thompson N
Leslie B. Holt YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Kevin A. Forder YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901THOMPSON, TONY UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 9/9/88 ORD: GRT APLE'S MO TO NOTE - 01 EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH NOTE - 02 EN BANC ONLY TO THE EXTENT NOTE - 02 THAT THE PETITION BE FILED W/I NOTE - 03 15 DAYS FM DATE OF THIS ORDER NOTE - 03 (NFX).
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/06/23 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - HOLTL FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - FORDERK FOR - APPELLEE
04/24/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/05/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/10/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) LESLIE B. HOLT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1987FiledRecord Completed
06/19/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/09/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (424 PGS - MITCHELL) PB PANEL SCDATE 060587 SCHPRD RT
11/23/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 112587 SCHPRD BA
12/15/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/25/88 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 122887 SCHPRD BE
01/21/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/17/88 PB PANEL SCDATE 012588 SCHPRD MXBE
02/19/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OUT OF TIME (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/19/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/23/1988FiledBriefing Completed
02/23/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/23/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE & CLK TO FL BE & TO SCHED FOR CONSIDER AS SOON AS BIZ OF CRT PERMITS.DS PANELPY SCDATE 020488 SCHPRD N
03/11/1988APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1988ORDER SS, SCHED CASE FOR ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 6/23/88. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/23/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/23/1988ARGUED PANELMKFESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/11/1988REVERSED AND REMANDED JDGMT RV JDGMT OF CONVICTION/ CAUSE RM FOR A NEW TRIAL PANELMKFESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/11/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - RVRM METH -OPN JUDGE -SW CITE 546 A.2d 414
08/11/1988OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - SW PAGE # - 1484
08/25/1988MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC OF APPELLEE TO SEPTEMBER 26, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/30/1988APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC JB PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD OPA
09/09/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 3 SL PANELMKFESC SCDATE 083188 SCHPRD VS
09/26/1988PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC (APPELLEE) JB PANEL SCDATE 092688 SCHPRD MRRB
09/30/1988ORDER APLT W/I 20 DAYS TO FILE RESPONSE TO PET FOR REH/REH EB (10 COPIES) SL PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1988APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLEE'S PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC RJG PANEL SCDATE 102088 SCHPRD ANSA
10/21/1988ORDER APLE OTSC IN 7 DAYS WHY MANDAT SHOULD NOT ISSUE FORTHWITH. ACG PANELMKFESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/24/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT TO OCTOBER 21ST ORDER REGARDING ISSUANCE OF MANDATE JB PANEL SCDATE 102888 SCHPRD ANSE
10/28/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/28/1988ORDER CLERK TO ISSUE MANDATE RE RELEASE PENDING DEC ON PTN FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC. PANELPY SCDATE 102688 SCHPRD Q
01/12/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(ORDER JUDGE QUEEN 11-16-88) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD