judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GAINES M. MOON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0312
Short Caption:GAINES M. MOON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F799-86Filed Date:03/16/1987

Opening Event Date:03/16/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/26/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/28/1989
Argued/Submitted:12/08/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/10/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGaines M. Moon N
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Steven W. Pelak YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MOON, GAINES M. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 092487 ORDER: COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 01 IN 10 DAYS TO FILE APLT BR OR NOTE - 02 HIS APPNTMNT SHALL BE VACATED NOTE - 02 & THIS MATTER REFERRED TO BPR.
03/16/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/15/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PETER H. MEYERS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/19/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 051887 SCHPRD R
05/21/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 052687 SCHPRD DSA
06/02/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/24/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 02. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 071387 SCHPRD BA
10/02/1987APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO SEPTEMBER 24TH COURT ORDER REGARDING FILING APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1987ORDER APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD CHECK
10/26/1987FiledRecord Completed
10/26/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (23 PGS - PAVLISH) JB PANEL SCDATE 120187 SCHPRD RT
10/27/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/15/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER RECEIPT OF TRANSCRIPT PB PANEL SCDATE 120787 SCHPRD BA
01/27/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (14 PGS RT - SIMMS) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (316 PGS RT - SIMMS) GT PANEL SCDATE 062888 SCHPRD RT
03/08/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/7/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 030889 SCHPRD BA
04/06/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 8TH JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/05/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-7-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/7/89; NFX. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 050889 SCHPRD Q
06/07/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 10, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 060789 SCHPRD BA
06/12/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/10/89. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 060889 SCHPRD M
06/27/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 071089 SCHPRD BA
07/26/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 28TH JB PANEL SCDATE 072789 SCHPRD BE
08/14/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/28/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 081089 SCHPRD X
08/28/1989FiledBriefing Completed
08/28/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF GG PANEL SCDATE 082889 SCHPRD BE
10/23/1989MOTION TO SUBMIT WITHOUT ARGUMENT OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/30/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO SUBMIT W/O ORAL ARGUMENT SL PANELNWFETE SCDATE 102489 SCHPRD VS
12/08/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/08/1989SUBMITTED PANELNWFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/20/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/20/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/10/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD