judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: THOMAS RUFFIN, JR.

Case Information: 87-CF-0311
Short Caption:IN RE: THOMAS RUFFIN, JR.Classification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10553-86Filed Date:03/16/1987

Opening Event Date:03/16/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/05/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/11/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantThomas T. Ruffin, Jr.N
Thomas T. Ruffin, Jr.NY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901RUFFIN JR, THOMAS IN THE MATTER OF:
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 110587 ORD: SS, THAT CRT-APTD NOTE - 01 COUNSEL SHOW CAUSE IN 10 DAYS NOTE - 02 WHY HIS APPTMENT UNDER CJA NOTE - 02 SHOULD NOT BE VACATED AS NOTE - 03 COUNSEL IS PURSUING AN APPEAL NOTE - 03 ON HIS OWN BEHALF.
03/16/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/01/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS RUFFIN, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 051887 SCHPRD R
06/05/1987FiledRecord Completed
06/05/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/17/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 071587 SCHPRD BA
07/17/1987RECEIVED APPELLANTS BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL LODGED BA; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS.DAS PANELPY SCDATE 072987 SCHPRD CHECK
11/05/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03 ACG PANELPY SCDATE 110287 SCHPRD BE
11/16/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO MAINTAIN APPOINTMENT UNDER CJA JB PANEL SCDATE 111687 SCHPRD ANSA
12/11/1987ORDER COUNSEL TO SHOW CAUSE IN 15 DAYS WHY APPEAL SHLD NOT BE DISMISSED. PANELPY SCDATE 120387 SCHPRD DDW
12/28/1987APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO ORDER 12/11/87 MLH PANEL SCDATE 122887 SCHPRD ANSA
02/19/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
02/19/1988ORDER CASE DISMISSED. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 010588 SCHPRD DDW
02/19/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE
03/11/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD