judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VANISI (SIAOSI) VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 34771
Short Caption:VANISI (SIAOSI) VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35249 , 45061 , 50607 , 65774 , 78209
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR980516Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Certiorari/Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/03/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/03/1999Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ. Original Petition for Writ of Certiorari or Mandamus and Request for Emergency Stay of Trial Pending Resolution of the Issues Presented Herein. 99-08303
09/03/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Permisison to File Points and Authorities in Support of the Writ in this Court under Seal; and Moton for an Order from this Court to the District Court Ordering it to Send, under Seal, the Order under Seal Filed on August 30, 1999, as well as that Sealed Portion of the Transcript of the Hearing Held on August 26, 1999; and Motion for an Order from this Court to the District Court Directing it to Deliver to Petitioner's Counsel only that Portion of the Sealed Transcript of the Hearing Held on August 26, 1999; and Request for Direction by this Court as to How to File in (or Deliver to) this Court the Above-Mentioned Points and Authorities without Subjecting Them to Public View and without Delivering Them to Counsel for the Real Party in Interest. 99-08304
09/07/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Request for Emergency Stay of Proceedings. 99-08352
09/09/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On September 10, 1999, the clerk of the district court is hereby directed to release to the Chief Assistant Clerk of the Court, Andrew Horstmanshoff, certified copies of all documents presently filed under seal in the pending criminal proceeding entitled State of Nevada v. Siaosi Vanisi, District Court Case Number CR98-0516. The documents will be received by the clerk of this court under seal for this court's in camera review. 99-08514
09/10/1999ExhibitFiled Exhibits (copies). Certified copies of documents presently filed UNDER SEAL in the pending criminal proceeding entitled State of Nevada v. Siaosi Vanisi, District Court Case Number CR98-0516. 99-08521
09/10/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Order Denying Petition for Writ of Certiorari or Mandamus. Having reviewed the documents before this court, we are not persuaded that this court's intervention by way of extraordinary writ is warranted at this time. " . . . we deny the petition." We deny petitioner's request for an emergency stay and the remaining motions filed in this matter. En Banc 99-08562
09/14/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On September 10, 1999, this court enter an order denying the petition for extraordinary and other relief in this matter. The clerk of this court shall return to the clerk of the district court unfiled and under seal the sealed documents previously received in this court on September 10, 1999. 99-08665
09/14/1999Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned to the clerk of the district court unfiled and under seal the sealed documents previously received in this court on September 10, 1999. 99-08521
10/06/1999RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 99-09585
10/06/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.