judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JACQUELINE OYEGUNLE V. D.C. DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES

Case Information: 10-AA-0868
Short Caption:JACQUELINE OYEGUNLE V. D.C. DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICESClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES1074-10Filed Date:07/16/2010

Opening Event Date:07/16/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/28/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerJacqueline Oyegunle YPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - UnemploymentN
Michael A. MilweeNN
Donna M. MuraskyNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/16/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
07/16/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
07/26/2010ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to July 16, 2010. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (dlm)
07/26/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
09/28/2010RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO REMAND
10/27/2010ORDER GRANTING RESPONDENT MOTION TO REMAND and the order on review is hereby vacated and the matter remanded to the agency for further action consistent with the motion. It is F/O that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith. (ETW)
10/27/2010VACATED
10/27/2010REMANDED
10/28/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived