judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PAUL DONALD ADKINS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-149)
Case Number:06-149Case Docketed On:06/28/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:PAUL DONALD ADKINS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:PAUL DONALD ADKINS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPaul Donald AdkinsKenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/28/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/28/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/28/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/11/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/14/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/25/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/25/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/02/2006Event - Phone Call from counsel for appellant re suggestion of death. Will file a motion to dismiss caseEventPhone CallFinal
10/05/2006Notice-Incoming - Suggestion of death pursuant to W.R.A.P Rule 17.01(c)Notice-IncomingSuggestion of deathFinal
10/24/2006Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
10/24/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal