judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

W. D. BELT, JR. v. TEXAS COMPANY

Case: A-16
A-16
01/07/1944
Application for Writ of Error
W. D. BELT, JR.
TEXAS COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/08/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/08/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/07/1944Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
02/03/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/02/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/17/1944Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
01/15/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
01/12/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
01/07/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/08/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/08/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/07/1944Supplemental Brief filed
02/03/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/02/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/17/1944Supplemental Brief filed
01/15/1944Response to Petition
01/12/1944Brief in Support of Petition
01/07/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
01/07/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Nelson and BrownAmicus Curiae
Texas CompanyRespondent
Angus G. WynneAmicus Curiae
J. Prentice WilsonAmicus Curiae
W. D. Belt, Jr.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information