Case Information: 40887 | |||
Short Caption: | BURT (RICHARD) VS. STATE C/W 40888/40889/40890/40891/40937 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 40887*, 40888 , 40889 , 40890 , 40891 , 40937 | Related Case(s): | 40843 , 40888 , 40889 , 40890 , 40891 , 40937 , 41174 , 41516 , 41517 , 41584 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C177149 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/05/2003 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/05/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 03-02066 | |
02/27/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. These are proper person appeals from decisions of the district court. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. "ORDER these appeals DISMISSED." fn5[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP03-MS/ML/NB. Nos. 40887/40888/ 40889/40890/40891/40937. | 03-03287 | |
03/25/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 03-03413 | |
03/25/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/03/2003 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 27, 2003. | 03-03413 |