judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JESSE WEEKLY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0435
Short Caption:JESSE WEEKLY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1282-84Filed Date:03/19/1987

Opening Event Date:03/19/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/01/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/25/1987
Argued/Submitted:09/23/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJesse Weekly N
William T. MorrisonYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WEEKLY, JESSE UNITED STATES
03/19/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/01/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/25/1987FiledBriefing Completed
09/23/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/20/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition