judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID M. WILSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0444
Short Caption:DAVID M. WILSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3017-86Filed Date:04/21/1987

Opening Event Date:04/21/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/13/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/30/1988
Argued/Submitted:10/20/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/21/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid M. Wilson N
James W. KleinNY
Jennifer P. LymanYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Glenn A. Fine YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILSON, DAVID M. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 2/1/89 ORD: SUA SPONTE THAT NOTE - 01 W/I 30 DAYS FM DATE OF THIS NOTE - 02 ORDER, APLT AND APLE SHALL NOTE - 02 FILE SUPPL. MEMORANDA NOTE - 03 ADDRESSING THE EFFECT OF THE NOTE - 03 RECENT DECISION IN U.S. V. NOTE - 04 BROCE, 57 U.S.L.W. 4158 (U.S. NOTE - 04 JAN. 23, 1989), ON THIS APPEAL
04/21/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/19/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/27/1987ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/17/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 062287 SCHPRD R
06/17/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (9 PGS - BURNS) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/26/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT PB PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD BA
07/08/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT ORDERED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1987FiledRecord Completed
11/13/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (18 PGS - MILLER) JB PANEL SCDATE 100187 SCHPRD RT
11/17/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/24/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (COPY OF INDICTMENT) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/28/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 27TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 122887 SCHPRD BA
01/27/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 17, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 012788 SCHPRD BA
02/04/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO FILE BRIEF ON OR BEF 2/17/88 (NFX) SL PANELPY SCDATE 020888 SCHPRD CHECK
02/17/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 24TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 021788 SCHPRD BA
02/23/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 2/24/88; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 021988 SCHPRD X
02/24/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 022488 SCHPRD BA
03/08/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (INDICTMENT) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/30/1988FiledBriefing Completed
03/30/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 033088 SCHPRD BE
07/29/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/01/1988LETTER LTR GRANTING REQ OF APLT FOR ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 10/20. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD CHECK
10/07/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO WITHDRAW REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT & TO SUBMIT ON BRIEFS (NO OPE) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1988RECEIVED STIPULATION OF PARTIES THAT SENTENCING LTR OF 3/26/87 BE MADE PART OF THE RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1988ORDER GRANT JOINT MO TO SUPP REC & CLK TO FL LTR OF SENTENCING OF J. DIXON AS SUPP REC. DAS PANELMKBEST SCDATE 101788 SCHPRD CHECK
10/19/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO W/D REQ FOR ORAL ARG & TO SUBMIT CASE ON BRFS. DAS PANELMKBEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD 3/26/87 LETTER OF SENTENCING FROM JUDGE DIXON. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/20/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/20/1988SUBMITTED PANELMKBEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/01/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 4 SL PANELMKBEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1989APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM COURT'S ORDER 2-1-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 030389 SCHPRD SME
02/28/1989MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 2/27/89 SUPP BRF OF APLE TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 030989 SCHPRD CHECK
03/06/1989APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1989MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 3/6/89 SUPP BRF OF APLT TO DISIVION. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/31/1989REMANDED ORDER RM CAUSE TO TRIAL COURT FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS PANELMKBEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/31/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - RM METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
06/21/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD