judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CALVIN I. COOPER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0443
Short Caption:CALVIN I. COOPER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2434-86Filed Date:04/22/1987

Opening Event Date:04/22/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/10/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/04/1988
Argued/Submitted:07/07/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/29/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCalvin I. Cooper N
Richard S. StolkerYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Glenn A. Fine YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901COOPER, CALVIN I. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: CARL COOPER NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 090287 ORDER: GRANT MO FOR LV NOTE - 02 TO FILE DOCKETING STATE; CLK NOTE - 03 TO FILE LDGD DOCKETING STATE; NOTE - 03 FO: MO FOR PREPARATION OF RT NOTE - 04 IS DENIED W/OUT PREJUDICE TO NOTE - 04 RENEWAL UPON COUNSEL INDICATNG NOTE - 05 A SPECIFIC NEED FOR PREPARATN NOTE - 05 OF A RT OF THE REFERENCED PRO- NOTE - 06 CEEDINGS, SEE Gaskins v. U.S., NOTE - 06 264 A.2d 589 (D.C. 1970). NOTE - 07 2/2/88 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO FOR NOTE - 07 LV TO FILE BRIEF; CLK DIRTD TO NOTE - 08 FILED LODGED BRIEF; APLE'S NOTE - 08 BRIEF DUE IN 30 DAYS.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/07/07 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - STOLKERR FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - FINEG FOR - APPELLEE
04/22/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/10/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RICHARD S. STOLKER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 051587 SCHPRD CHECK
06/17/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 062287 SCHPRD R
06/24/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 062287 SCHPRD DSA
07/01/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (DOCKET ENTRIES) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/02/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/22/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR AN ORDER COM- PELLING THE PREPARATION OF THE COMPLETE TRANSCRIPTS JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/02/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT EBP PANEL SCDATE 072887 SCHPRD OPE
09/02/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 06. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 071387 SCHPRD OPE
11/10/1987FiledRecord Completed
11/10/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(212 PGS. -- RONAN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/24/1987ORDER APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 110387 SCHPRD RT
01/06/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 010488 SCHPRD BA
01/06/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/02/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/02/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 7 AND 8 SL PANELPY SCDATE 012788 SCHPRD M
02/04/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/8/88 (NO OPPO) PB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 030388 SCHPRD BE
03/04/1988FiledBriefing Completed
03/04/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 030888 SCHPRD BE
06/06/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT & FOR CONTINUANCE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/15/1988ORDER GRANT REQ OF APLT FOR ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 7/7/88. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 060888 SCHPRD VS
07/07/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/07/1988ARGUED PANELNWFEBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/08/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWFEBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/08/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/29/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD