judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ERNEST PERSHA V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0169
Short Caption:ERNEST PERSHA V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead:87-CF-0169Consolidated: 87-CF-0272
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F644-86Filed Date:02/11/1987

Opening Event Date:02/11/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/20/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/19/1989
Argued/Submitted:09/25/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/19/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantErnest Persha N
Sandra J. Boek YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Su Zann Lamb YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PERSHA, ERNEST UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: DEBRA PERSHA, CALITA NOTE - 01 JAMES PERSHA, JR. & NOTE - 02 CALITA MUNSON NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 CON 87-272 NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 011188 ORDER: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 04 IN 87-272 FOR EXT TO FILE BR NOTE - 05 UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER RT HAS NOTE - 05 BEEN FILED; FO: DENY APLT MO NOTE - 06 FOR RT IN 87-169 W/OUT PREJU- NOTE - 06 DICE TO ITS RENEWAL BEFORE THE NOTE - 07 TRIAL COURT FOR ITS CONS IN NOTE - 07 THE FIRST INSTANCE; FO: COUNS NOTE - 08 FOR APLT IN 87-169 W/IN 10 DYS NOTE - 08 TO FILE APPROPRIATE MO FOR RT NOTE - 09 IN THE TR CT & SERVE A COPY NOTE - 09 THEREOF W/THIS COURT.
02/11/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) SANDRA J. BOEK, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/03/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DS (APPELLANT'S) INDEFINITELY UNTIL THE RECORD ON APPEAL IS COMPLETED RJG PANEL SCDATE 041087 SCHPRD DSA
04/14/1987RECORD ON APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 041387 SCHPRD R
04/29/1987ORDER GRT MO; APLT'S BR DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. TTC PANELPY SCDATE 041587 SCHPRD OPE
05/14/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: NO DSA. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 051187 SCHPRD DSA
05/21/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/21/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE ORDER 5/14/87 MLH PANEL SCDATE 052587 SCHPRD STATE
06/01/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT TTC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1987ORDER CLK IS DIR TO FILE THE LDGD DSA; APLT'S SRT DUE IN 10 DAYS. TTC PANELPY SCDATE 060187 SCHPRD CHECK
06/10/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/11/1987APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE IN RESPONSE TO COURT'S 6/1/87 ORDER RJG PANEL SCDATE 061187 SCHPRD STATE
09/02/1987ORDER SS, CONS 87-169 & 87-272; APLT BRS DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 062287 SCHPRD OPE
11/20/1987FiledRecord Completed
11/20/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/20/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (1086 PGS - TOOBY) PB PANEL SCDATE 100287 SCHPRD RT
12/01/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR TRANSCRIPT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 123087 SCHPRD BA
12/11/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD IS FILED (TRANSCRIPT) IN #87-272 MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04 - 09. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 121887 SCHPRD OPE
02/08/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OF TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/08/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR PRODUC- TION OF TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/31/1988ORDER APLTS' BRIEFS DUE W/IN 40 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 021788 SCHPRD OPE
04/22/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (17 PGS - RONAN) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 10, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 051088 SCHPRD BA
06/09/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 10TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 061088 SCHPRD BA
06/22/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 7/10/88; CON BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELPY SCDATE 061588 SCHPRD V
07/12/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 071088 SCHPRD BA
07/29/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF LATE (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 072188 SCHPRD CHECK
08/10/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 081588 SCHPRD BE
09/14/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/14/1988ORDER GRNT APLT MO FOR LV TO FILE BR & GRNT APLE MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 30 DAYS AFTR RT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD CHECK
12/29/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (149 PGS/TOOBY) AD PANEL SCDATE 113088 SCHPRD RT
01/30/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 1ST (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 013089 SCHPRD BE
02/14/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 3/1/89. ANY FUR REQ WILL BE DISFAVORED. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 020989 SCHPRD CHECK
03/06/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OUT OF TIME JB PANEL SCDATE 030189 SCHPRD BE
03/06/1989APLE MOTION FOR LV TO FILE BRF IN EXCESS OF PAGES JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/21/1989APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF OF APPELLANT IN 87-272 TO MARCH 31ST (NO OPE) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/10/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 033189 SCHPRD CHECK
04/19/1989FiledBriefing Completed
04/19/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FO LV TO LATE FL BRIEF & IN EXCESS OF FIFTY PAGES,BRF IS HEREBY FILED. PB PANEL SCDATE 032089 SCHPRD OPA
07/25/1989MOTION TO SUBMIT WITHOUT ARGUMENT (APPELLANT) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/03/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO SUBMIT ON REG CAL OF 9/25/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 072689 SCHPRD VS
09/25/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/25/1989SUBMITTED PANELNWFEBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELNWFEBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/19/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD