Case Information: 46696 | |||
Short Caption: | ESTEBAN (PEDRO) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 41423 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C184880 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/11/2006 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/31/2006 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/31/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 06-02247 | |
02/13/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 60 days. | 06-03080 | |
04/11/2006 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 7. | 06-07622 | |
04/11/2006 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/10/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn27[We have reviewed all proper person documents and conclude that no relief is warranted.] NNP06-MD/NB/RP | 06-14091 | |
08/04/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-15734 | |
08/04/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/18/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 8, 2006. | 06-15734 |