judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THE STATE OF WYOMING v. MARIO GARCIA

Case Heading (06-210)
Case Number:06-210Case Docketed On:09/11/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Big Horn CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:THE STATE OF WYOMING v. MARIO GARCIA
Full Title:THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. MARIO GARCIA, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling
Michelle M. McColloch Burns
AppelleeMario GarciaBrigita Smilga Krisjansons
Kenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/11/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/11/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA received. Requested from clerk of district court.Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
09/11/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/12/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/12/2006Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
09/14/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter - corrected to be addressed to counsel for appellant rather than appelleeNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/22/2006Order - Dismiss - jurisdictionOrderDismiss - jurisdictionFinal
10/17/2006Event - Phone Call - Contacted counsel for appellant, Ms. Burns, regarding nonpayment of sanction. She will send today.EventPhone CallFinal
10/19/2006Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
10/19/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal