judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GRUNDY (RICKY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34772
Short Caption:GRUNDY (RICKY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35569 , 43104 , 49361
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C141735Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/07/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/07/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-08323
10/01/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed without prejudice to appellant's right to file a timely notice of appeal from the judgment of conviction after sentencing. 99-09451
11/19/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-11524
12/15/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-12660
12/15/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/03/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 20, 1999. 99-12660