Case Information: 46683 | |||
Short Caption: | CINQUE (JAMAA) VS. STATE C/W 46682 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 46682 *, 46683 | Related Case(s): | 42123 , 46012 , 47885 , 50487 , 53486 , 53656 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR030888 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/27/2006 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/27/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 06-02084 | |
02/24/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. "ORDER these appeals DISMISSED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP. Nos. 46682/46683. | 06-04122 | |
03/22/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-04439 | |
03/22/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/30/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 23, 2006. | 06-04439 |