judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

O'BRIEN, TIMOTHY DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 86-CT-1047
Short Caption:O'BRIEN, TIMOTHY DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - Traffic
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:T11181-85Filed Date:07/07/1986

Opening Event Date:07/07/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/16/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
John H. Spaulding NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901O'BRIEN, TIMOTHY DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
07/07/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/29/1986RECORD ON APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 090886 SCHPRD R
02/05/1988ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE $50 DOCKETING FEE OR CASE SHALL BE DISMISSED. PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/24/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
02/24/1988ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL. (NO FEE) EBP PANELPY SCDATE 021588 SCHPRD CHECK
02/24/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE
03/16/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD