Case: 10-0404
10-0404
05/28/2010
Second Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
KENDALL/HEATON ASSOCIATES, INC.
TELLEPSEN BUILDERS, L.P.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/08/2010 | Supplemental appendix | Event related to first petition filed in case. | Supplemental Appendix to Petition for Review #1. On behalf of Kendall/Heaton Associates, Inc. (12) | |
06/08/2010 | Supplemental appendix | Event related to subsequent petition filed in case. | Supplement to appendix: court of appeals judgment (12) filed on behalf of CBM Engineers, Inc. | |
06/01/2010 | Appendix Filed | Event related to subsequent petition filed in case. | attached to petition | |
06/01/2010 | Petition for Review #2 | Petitioner | Petition for review appendix attached (12) filed on behalf of CBM Engineers, Inc. | |
05/28/2010 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | attached to petition | |
05/28/2010 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition appendix attached (12) filed on behalf of Kendall/Heaton Associates, Inc. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/14/2010 | Case Stored | Row 17 I-2 | | |
09/30/2010 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Certified copy of notice sent to the Court of Appeals | | |
08/20/2010 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
08/20/2010 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
06/22/2010 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
06/22/2010 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
06/21/2010 | Response Waiver filed | Respondent, Tellepsen Builders, L.P., response waiver to both petitions for review. (orig & 11) | | |
06/08/2010 | Supplemental appendix | Supplemental Appendix to Petition for Review #1. On behalf of Kendall/Heaton Associates, Inc. (12) | | |
06/08/2010 | Supplemental appendix | Supplement to appendix: court of appeals judgment (12) filed on behalf of CBM Engineers, Inc. | ||
06/01/2010 | Appendix Filed | attached to petition | | |
06/01/2010 | Petition for Review #2 | Petition for review appendix attached (12) filed on behalf of CBM Engineers, Inc. | ||
05/28/2010 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Left message for Mr. Gallagher. Requested court of appeals judgment. | | |
05/28/2010 | Appendix Filed | attached to petition | | |
05/28/2010 | Petition for Review | Petition appendix attached (12) filed on behalf of Kendall/Heaton Associates, Inc. |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
10/14/2010 | Case Stored | Case stored. | Row 17 I-2 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Advanced Concrete Surfaces, Ltd. | Other interested party | Mr. Vincent Glocksien |
First American Group Construction | Other interested party | |
CBM Engineers, Inc. | Petitioner 2 | Mr. Gregory Norman Ziegler Mr. Bryan G. Rutherford |
Kendall/Heaton Associates, Inc. | Petitioner | Mr. Michael Murphy Gallagher Ms. Leslie M. Henry Mr. John P. Cahill Jr. |
Tellepsen Builders, L.P. | Respondent | Ms. Michelle E. Robberson Mr. John Wesley Raley Mr. R. Douglas Rees |
Court of Appeals Information:
01-08-00295-CV
Reversed & Remanded
325 SW3d 692, 04-15-10
1st Court of Appeals
Honorable Michael C. Massengale
Trial Court Information
269th District Court
Harris
Honorable John T. Wooldridge
2006-44489