Case Information: 40851 | |||
Short Caption: | BOLIEN, SR. (HARVEY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - PC2595 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 02/25/2004 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/31/2003 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/31/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 03-01716 | |
01/31/2003 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | ||
03/28/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Carl M. Joerger shall have 10 days from the date of this order within which to: (1) file a case appeal statement pursuant to NRAP 3(a)(1); and (2) file and serve a rough draft request form, if necessary. Thereafter, Joerger shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to file and serve a fast track statement and appendix as required by NRAP 3C(e). This court cautions counsel that his failure to comply with this order or communicate with this court respecting the reasons for counsel's delay may result in the imposition of sanctions. | 03-05252 | |
04/07/2003 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: Petition for Post Conviction Relief on October 3, 2002. Court Reporter: Jeanie Wright. | 03-05764 | |
04/16/2003 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: October 3, 2002. Court Reporter: Jeanie Wright. Filed in district court on: 03/25/03. | 03-06478 | |
04/16/2003 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: December 10, 2002. Court Reporter: Joann Orduna. Filed in district court on: 01/23/03. | 03-06479 | |
04/18/2003 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: December 24, 2002. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. | 03-06631 | |
04/21/2003 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (First request). | 03-06739 | |
04/22/2003 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed April 21, 2003. Appelant shall have 5 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. | 03-06880 | |
04/30/2003 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: December 10, 2002. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. | 03-07329 | |
05/05/2003 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 03-07539 | |
05/05/2003 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 03-07540 | |
05/20/2003 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 03-08487 | |
05/20/2003 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. Vols. 1 through 6. | 03-08488 | |
07/03/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Full Briefing. This court has concluded that full briefing of this appeal is warranted. Opening brief due: 30 days. fn1[If a party's brief will cite to documents not previously filed in this court, that party shall file and serve an appropriately documented supplemental appendix with the brief.] fn2[We suspend the requirement in NRAP 9 for counsel to file a certified transcript.] Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31. | 03-11146 | |
08/07/2003 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 03-13235 | |
08/07/2003 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Appellant's Supplemental Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2. | 03-13236 | |
09/10/2003 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 03-15203 | |
09/10/2003 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Supplemental Appendix. | 03-15204 | |
10/23/2003 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. No reply brief filed. | ||
11/03/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Returning Proper Person Documents. On October 17, 2003, this court received proper person documents from Chris A. Hightower. We note that Mr. Hightower is not a party to this appeal. Furthermore, Mr. Hightower's connection to this appeal and interest in its outcome is unclear. We note that appellant is represented by counsel in this appeal. Accordingly, we decline to grant Mr. Hightower permission to file documents in proper person. See NRAP 46(b). We direct the clerk of this court to return, unfiled, the proper person documents received on October 17, 2003. Mr. Hightower shall address all questions and concerns regarding this appeal to appellant's counsel. | 03-18295 | |
11/03/2003 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. to Chris A. Hightower. Returned unfiled, the original "Proper Person Affidavit from Chris A. Hightower, received on October 17, 2003." | ||
02/25/2004 | Case Status Update | Resubmitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP04-NB/DA/MG | ||
07/01/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn10[We have reviewed all of Bolien's additional arguments and conclude they are without merit.] Agosti, J. and Gibbons, J. Becker, J., dissenting. NNP04-NB/DA/MG | 04-12095 | |
07/27/2004 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 04-12372 | |
07/27/2004 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/03/2004 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 29, 2004. | 04-12372 |