Case Information: 46690 | |||
Short Caption: | CLODFELTER VS. DIST. CT. (NEWTON) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A503390 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Cherry, Douglas | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/30/2006 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in related district court proceedings. | ||
01/30/2006 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Prince & Keating--check no. 17137. | ||
01/30/2006 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 06-02113 | |
01/30/2006 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. | 06-02114 | |
01/30/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion for Stay. Petitioners Brenda Clodfelter and Wade Clodfelters's Motion to Stay Judgment pending Writ Petition. | 06-02115 | |
02/06/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion for Stay. Petitioners' Supplement to Their Motion to Stay Judgment Pending Writ Petition. | 06-02589 | |
02/07/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for Temporary Stay and Directing Answer. We temporarily stay execution of the attorney fees award in Justice Court of Las Vegas Township Case No. 98C-002908-001, as appealed in Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A503390, including the schedule sheriff sales of petitioners' property. Real party in interest shall refrain from any further attempts to suspend petitioners' driver's licenses while this stay is in effect. Real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. | 06-02742 | |
02/10/2006 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. | 06-03019 | |
02/13/2006 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Supplement to Opposition to Motion to Stay Enforcement. | 06-03127 | |
02/14/2006 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. Returned, with letter (pursuant to NRAP 27(a)), "Petitioners' Reply to Real Party in Interest's Opposition to This Court's Order Granting a Temporary Stay." | 06-03249 | |
03/01/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for Stay. On February 7, 2006, we entered an order granting a temporary stay. We conclude that the stay should remain in effect pending our resolution of this petition. fn2[We deny the requests for sanctions made by both petitioners and real party in interest. The Honorable Miriam Shearing, Senior Justice, and the Honorable Deborah A. Agosti, Senior Justice participated in the decision of this matter under general orders of assignment entered January 6, 2006.] | 06-04611 | |
03/13/2006 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. | 06-05331 | |
03/13/2006 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Newton's Appendix. | 06-05363 | |
11/28/2006 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Cherry. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
06/07/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Granting Petition. Granting Petition for Writ of Mandamus. "We grant this petition and direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus." NNP07-RP/JH/NS | 07-12437 | |
06/07/2007 | Writ | Issued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Richard A. Englemann for service upon Chief Judge Kathy A. Hardcastle. | 07-12472 | |
06/15/2007 | Writ | Filed Writ. Served on Judge Hardcastle on June 11, 2007. | 07-12472 | |
06/15/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Judge Hardcastle served with Writ of Mandamus. | 07-13167 | |
07/03/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 07-13525 | |
07/03/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |