judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GREGORY JONES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0323
Short Caption:GREGORY JONES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F05937-85Filed Date:02/19/1987

Opening Event Date:02/19/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/24/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/06/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGregory Jones N
Thomas M. Slawson NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JONES, GREGORY UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 FE: ORDER DENYING MOTION TO NOTE - 01 RECONSIDER & MODIFY SENTENCE NOTE - 02 092487 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO NOTE - 02 FOR EXT TO FILE BR ONLY TO THE NOTE - 03 EXTENT THAT COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 03 IN 20 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: NOTE - 04 STATUS OF RT, W/NAME OF CT RPT NOTE - 04 EST # OF PGS & EST COMP DATE.
02/19/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/17/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 042187 SCHPRD R
05/15/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS M. SLAWSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/21/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 052687 SCHPRD DSA
05/21/1987RECEIVED COPY OF APLT'S MOTION FOR PRO- DUCTION OF TRANSCRIPT FILED IN TRIAL COURT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/21/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (6 PGS. - JOYNER) PM PANEL SCDATE 062287 SCHPRD RT
08/24/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/24/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/01/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD BA
09/24/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 091487 SCHPRD OPE
10/13/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RE: STATUS OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 101487 SCHPRD STATE
11/02/1987ORDER APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 102387 SCHPRD CHECK
02/08/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 2/7/86 RT FROM CT RPTR BURNEY. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/25/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS AFTER RECIEPT OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (7 PGS. -- WILLIAMS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 051588 SCHPRD RT
06/21/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 27TH JB PANEL SCDATE 062088 SCHPRD BA
06/24/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) OF THOMAS M. SLAWSON AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1989AFFIRMED JUDGMENT GRNTNG APLT COUNSEL'S MO TO W/DRAW & AFFIRMING THE ORDER ON APPEAL. ACG PANELFETE SCDATE 022389 SCHPRD VS
03/14/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE
04/06/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD