judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MUSA, EMMANUEL L. DISTRICT OF COLUMIA

Case Information: 86-CT-1520
Short Caption:MUSA, EMMANUEL L. DISTRICT OF COLUMIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - Traffic
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:T2227-86Filed Date:10/15/1986

Opening Event Date:10/15/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/24/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/01/1988
Argued/Submitted:07/12/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/23/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Thomas M. Slawson YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charlotte Brookins-Hudson YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MUSA, EMMANUEL L. DISTRICT OF COLUMIA
10/15/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/14/1987RECORD ON APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 121586 SCHPRD R
01/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS M. SLAWSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/24/1987FiledRecord Completed
03/11/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/19/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR, APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS CT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 031187 SCHPRD OPE
09/15/1987ORDER SS, COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 20 DYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF RT W/EST COMP DATE OF RT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (12 PGS - HAWKINS) JB PANEL SCDATE 070187 SCHPRD RT
11/18/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LV TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S 9/15/87 ORDER PB PANEL SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD STATE
11/18/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S STATEMENT RE: STATUS OF TRANSCRIPT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/24/1987APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO 9/15/87 ORDER. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/24/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR LV TO FILE ANS TO 9/15 ORD, CLK TO FILE LDGD ANS, BE DUE 12/30/87. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 120887 SCHPRD EBP
01/05/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 1, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 123087 SCHPRD BE
01/29/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF ONLY TO EXTENT BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 012788 SCHPRD X
03/01/1988FiledBriefing Completed
03/01/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 022988 SCHPRD BE
07/12/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/12/1988SUBMITTED PANELPYMKSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/01/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
08/01/1988ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. EBP PANELPYMKSC SCDATE 071288 SCHPRD RDEC
08/01/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
08/23/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD