judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MANN, LAWRENCE SHELLY DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 86-CT-1188
Short Caption:MANN, LAWRENCE SHELLY DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - DC Non-Traffic
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DC668-86Filed Date:08/11/1986

Opening Event Date:08/11/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/23/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/03/1987
Argued/Submitted:08/19/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Leslie Scherr YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MANN, LAWRENCE SHELLY DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
08/11/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/23/1986FiledRecord Completed
04/03/1987FiledBriefing Completed
08/19/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
08/26/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition