judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LARRY DANIELS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0429
Short Caption:LARRY DANIELS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead: 87-CF-0134 Consolidated:87-CF-0429, 87-CF-0592
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2312-86Filed Date:04/02/1987

Opening Event Date:04/02/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/09/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/22/1988
Argued/Submitted:11/10/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/16/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLarry Daniels N
Joanne D. Slaight YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Ann K. H. SimonYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DANIELS, LARRY UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 9/1/87 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 01 TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; NOTE - 02 JOANNE SLAIGHT APPTD TO REPSNT NOTE - 02 APLT FOR APPEAL; NEWLY APPTD NOTE - 03 COUNSEL TO FL DSA IN 10 DAYS; NOTE - 03 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL STATE NOTE - 04 IN 20 DAYS INDICATING WHETHER NOTE - 04 RT WILL BE ORDERED FOR APPEAL. NOTE - 05 101487 ORDER: SS, CONS 87-429 NOTE - 05 & 87-592; CLK OF SUP CT TO NOTE - 06 TRANSMIT TO THIS CT THE RT OF NOTE - 06 11/24/86 TR PROCEEDINGS AS A NOTE - 07 SUP RECORD FORTHWITH; FO: BRS NOTE - 07 OF APLTS DUE 40 DAYS THEREAFT. NOTE - 08 CON 87-134 & 87-592 NOTE - 08 NOTE - 09 SEE 87-134 NOTE - 09 NOTE - 10 111987 ORDER: GRANT APLE REQ NOTE - 10 TO CONSOLIDATE 87-134 W/CONS NOTE - 11 NOS. 87-429 & 87-592, APLTS NOTE - 11 BRS DUE IN 40 DAYS, FO:CONS BR NOTE - 12 OF APLE DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER NOTE - 12 NOTE - 13 3/9/90 ORD: JUDGE FARRELL HAS NOTE - 13 RECUSED FROM THIS CASE. JUDGE NOTE - 14 NEWMAN WOULD GRANT REHEARING. NOTE - 14 CHIEF JUDGE ROGERS & JUDGES NOTE - 15 NEWMAN AND FERREN WOULD GRANT NOTE - 15 REHEARING EN BANC.
01/01/1904JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/11/10 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - SIMONA FOR - APPELLEE TRDATE- 88/11/10 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - MASONT FOR - APLT JERRY ATTY 2 - STEINMETZC FOR - APLT IRICK ATTY 3 - SLAIGHTJ FOR - APLT LARRY
04/02/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/01/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 060187 SCHPRD R
06/11/1987LETTER TO APLT RE APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL (FORM 5) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/22/1987LETTER OF 6/11/87 TO APPELLANT RESENT THIS DATE RE: APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL PANEL SCDATE 071387 SCHPRD ANSA
07/20/1987LETTER OF 6/11/87 RESENT TO APPELLANT THIS DATE. PANEL SCDATE 072287 SCHPRD ANSA
08/07/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (2264 PGS - BURNS) VOL. I,II & III PB PANEL SCDATE 080787 SCHPRD RT
08/10/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS PB PANEL SCDATE 081987 SCHPRD ANSA
08/12/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 SEE 87-592 (43 PGS. - KACZOROWSKI) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/01/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOANNE SLAIGHT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/01/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD OPE
09/11/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 091187 SCHPRD DSA
09/16/1987STATEMENT RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 092187 SCHPRD STATE
10/09/1987FiledRecord Completed
10/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (124 PGS RT-HOLLAND) MLH PANEL SCDATE 110187 SCHPRD RT
10/14/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05 - 07. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 062387 SCHPRD RT
10/15/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/19/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 10 - 12. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 112487 SCHPRD BA
12/23/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JAN. 29TH (NO OPE) MLH PANEL SCDATE 122987 SCHPRD BA
12/28/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JAN. 29TH IN 87-592(NO OPE) MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/9/88 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 012988 SCHPRD BA
01/29/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-592 TO FEBRUARY 5TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/08/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 020988 SCHPRD BA
02/08/1988ORDER GRANT MO'S OF APLTS TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 2/9/88. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 020288 SCHPRD X
02/09/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF FOR APPELLANT JERRY DANIELS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 12, 1988 (NO OPPO FROM JERRY DANIELS ONLY) RJG PANEL SCDATE 031488 SCHPRD BE
04/06/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 5/12/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 032988 SCHPRD OPA
05/02/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (267 PGS - CARTER) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/26/88 (NO OPA) MLH PB PANEL SCDATE 051288 SCHPRD BE
05/27/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF ONE DAY LATE JB PANEL SCDATE 052688 SCHPRD BE
05/27/1988APLE MOTION FOR LV TO FILE BRF IN EXCESS OF PAGES JB PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/27/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/22/1988FiledBriefing Completed
06/22/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF (APPELLANT) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO EXTEND PAGE LIMIT FOR REPLY BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT IN 87-592 FOR LV TO FL REPLY BRF & CLK TO FL RBA. DAS PANELNWBESC SCDATE 110388 SCHPRD VS
11/08/1988APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF IN 87-592 DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/10/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/10/1988ARGUED PANELNWBESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1989AFFIRMED JDGMT AF JDGMT OF CONVICTION PANELNWBESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -SW CITE
10/05/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - SW PAGE # - 2254 OPINION TYPE D JUDGE - NW PAGE # - 0000
10/19/1989MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC TO 11-2-89 APLT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC ON OR BEFORE 11/2/89 SL PANELRO SCDATE 103189 SCHPRD OPE
11/02/1989PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC (APPELLANT'S) RJG PANEL SCDATE 110289 SCHPRD MRRB
11/02/1989STATEMENT OF APLT FOR ADOPTION OF CO-APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/08/1990ORDER APLE W/I 20 DAYS TO FILE RESPONSE TO PET FOR REH/REH EB (10 COPIES) SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1990APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO PET. FOR REH/REH EN BANC AD PANEL SCDATE 012990 SCHPRD ANSE
03/16/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD