judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LEROY JENKINS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0430
Short Caption:LEROY JENKINS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2701-83Filed Date:04/06/1987

Opening Event Date:04/06/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/09/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/09/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLeroy Jenkins N
Thomas M. Slawson YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JENKINS, LEROY UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 FE: ARMED ROBBERY NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 APPEAL FROM ORDER DENYING NOTE - 02 POST CONVICTION RELIEF
04/06/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/09/1987FiledRecord Completed
06/09/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 060587 SCHPRD R
06/10/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS M. SLAWSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 062987 SCHPRD CHECK
06/22/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 062287 SCHPRD DSA
06/09/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/14/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/11/88 GT PB PANEL SCDATE 071188 SCHPRD BE
08/08/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE OF APPELLEE MLH PANEL SCDATE 081188 SCHPRD BE
12/19/1988AFFIRMED JUDGMENT GRANTING MO FOR SUMM AFFIRMANCE & AFFIRMING THE ORD ON APPEAL. ACG PANELROST SCDATE 072287 SCHPRD RT
12/19/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE
01/09/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD